+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 24, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248)
On March 16, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 248 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1862ER)
On February 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 2-N)
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 035075870-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendments by Del. O'Bannon agreed to
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 28, 2003 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from P. & E. w/amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/07/03 035075870
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 14, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2003: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N)
January 24, 2003: Reported from P. & E. w/amendment (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor