+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0256)
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 256 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1860ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Senator Newman agreed to
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (35-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1860H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 071154554-H1
- Read second time
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 071154554-H1
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 3, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 072199554
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 20, 2007: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2007: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2007: VOTE: (35-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2007: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2007: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor