+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0573)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 573 (effective 12/1/13)
On March 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1859ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 14-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 11105397D-S1 (84-Y 14-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1859S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 11105397D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 11105397D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Immigration
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 18-N)
- Read third time and passed House (81-Y 18-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 11100232D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1859E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 6, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (16-Y 4-N)
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #3 Immigration
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100232D