+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 24, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0119)
On March 16, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 119 (effective 7/1/99)
On February 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1859ER)
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (14-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 3-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (17-Y 1-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 15, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 991703396
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1999: Reported from A. C. & N. R. (14-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N)
February 6, 1999: Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (17-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor