+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0064)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 64 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/24/15
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1859ER)
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (36-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 1-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103180D
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 2015: Passed Senate (36-Y 1-N)
February 16, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2015: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 1-N)
February 3, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2015: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (4)
Todd E. Pillion
Type:
Primary Sponsor