+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0734)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Enacted, Chapter 734 (effective 7/1/15)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1857ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1857ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendment (9-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101857D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
April 15, 2015: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
April 15, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2015: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2015: Reported from Local Government with amendment (9-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2015: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor