+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 14, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0144)
On March 13, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 144 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2001 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1857ER)
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Motion to rec. passed by for the day agreed to (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 19, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 15, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Militia and Police (23-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/04/01 015205844
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2001: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2001: Reported from Militia and Police (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor