+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 27, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0753)
On March 26, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 753 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2001 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1855ER)
On February 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 14-N)
- Read third time and passed House (84-Y 14-N)
- Motion to reconsider engrossment rejected
On January 24, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (25-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/04/01 014557844
+ − Votes (5)
February 9, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2001: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 14-N)
January 22, 2001: Reported from General Laws (25-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor