+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N)
On February 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N)
- Read third time and passed House (52-Y 47-N)
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 8-N)
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N)
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102235D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (4)
February 22, 2022: Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N)
February 3, 2022: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N)
January 28, 2022: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 8-N)
January 25, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor