+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 31, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0622)
On March 25, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 622 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 7, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1847ER)
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 7, 1995 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (76-Y 23-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 23-N)
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD6430152-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Floor amendment rejected (Phillips)
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/amds. (17-Y 5-N)
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to C. N. R. sub-committee: Ad Hoc
On January 19, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed LD6430152
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1995: Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 23-N)
February 3, 1995: Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/amds. (17-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor