+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Engrossment refused by House
- Read second time
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 4-N)
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/07/03 034167903
+ − Vote
January 31, 2003: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor