+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0833)
On April 14, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 833 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB184ER)
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
- Senate sub. w/amds. agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N)
On March 5, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee sub. w/amds HB184S1
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 041024820-S1
- Passed Senate with sub. w/amds. (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with sub. w/amds. (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 041024820-S1
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 040955444-H1
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 040955444-EH1
- Amendment by Del. Oder agreed to
- Engrossed by House - committee sub.w/amd HB184EH1
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 040955444-H1
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/06/04 047404444
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
March 8, 2004: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
March 4, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2004: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2004: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2004: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2004: Reported from C. J. with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor