+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 9, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0049)
On March 5, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 49 (effective 7/1/99)
On February 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1839ER)
On February 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 991306340-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Title replaced
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 29, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/amds. (26-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 2
On January 14, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 991306340
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1999: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1999: Reported from Tra. w/amds. (26-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor