+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100857D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (3)
February 5, 2021: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2021: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2021: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor