+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- House sustained Governor's veto
- Placed on Calendar
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1836ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 17103242D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1836E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103242D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 20, 2017: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2017: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2017: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2017: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2017: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 2, 2017: Reported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor