+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (58)
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0854)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1836ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (100-Y 0-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 854 (effective 7/1/07)
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2007 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1836ER)
On February 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Conference substitute printed 072810212-H1
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Amundson, Suit, Rapp
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Whipple, Locke, Bell
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House (2-Y 96-N)
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1836S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 072805824-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 072805824-S1
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 071402212-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1836E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing (Suit)
On January 3, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 071402212
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (11)
April 4, 2007: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
April 4, 2007: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2007: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2007: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N)
February 19, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2007: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2007: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor