+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0841)
On March 22, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 841 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1831ER)
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N)
- Read third time and passed House (89-Y 10-N)
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 031433856-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Del. Orrock agreed to
- Committee amendment #2 rejected
- Committee amendments #1 and #3 agreed to
- Read second time
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from A., C. & N. R. w/amendments (19-Y 3-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/07/03 031433856
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 12, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2003: Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N)
January 22, 2003: Reported from A., C. & N. R. w/amendments (19-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor