+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 1-N)
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N)
- Read third time and passed House (64-Y 35-N)
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (17-Y 4-N)
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement
On December 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101008D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (8)
February 25, 2020: Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
February 24, 2020: Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
February 24, 2020: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2020: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 1-N)
January 29, 2020: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N)
January 23, 2020: Reported from General Laws (17-Y 4-N)
January 21, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Mark H. Levine
Type:
Primary Sponsor