+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0213)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 213 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1829ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 11103328D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1829E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103328D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2011: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor