+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 14, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0132)
On March 6, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 132 (effective 7/1/97)
On February 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 13, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1828ER)
On February 11, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with amd. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 973402144-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 24, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 23, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed 973402144
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 11, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1997: Reported from General Laws with amd. (15-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 22, 1997: Reported from C. C. T. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor