+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0005)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 5 (effective 7/1/21)
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2021
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 11, 2021
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1825ER)
- Enrolled
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (35-Y 3-N 1-A)
- Read third time
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (80-Y 19-N)
- Read third time and passed House (80-Y 19-N)
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 1-N)
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101872D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (5)
February 3, 2021: Passed Senate (35-Y 3-N 1-A)
February 2, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2021: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2021: VOTE: Passage (80-Y 19-N)
January 15, 2021: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor