+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 21, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0305)
On March 16, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 305 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 2, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 24, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1823ER)
On February 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented & ordered printed LD4577809
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1995: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1995: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor