+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 160 (effective 7/1/21)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0160)
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1820ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1820H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 21103357D-H1
- Read second time
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
- Committee substitute printed 21103357D-H1
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Social Services
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101472D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (12)
February 18, 2021: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2021: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2021: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2021: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2021: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2021: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2021: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor