+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 585 (effective 1/1/16 see bill)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0585)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1819ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N 1-A)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105251D-S1 (96-Y 1-N 1-A)
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1819S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15105251D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15105251D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (10-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N 1-A))
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104760D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1819H1
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15104760D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102422D
+ − Votes (8)
February 24, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N 1-A)
February 23, 2015: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N)
February 20, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 16, 2015: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (10-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N 1-A)
February 4, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor