+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 13104088D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102154D