+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 25, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0186)
On March 17, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 186 (effective-see bill)
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1818ER)
On February 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (93-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 3-N 1-A)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Printed as reengrossed 995225809-E
- Reengrossed by House as amended
- Pending question ordered
- Amendment by Mrs. Crittenden agreed to
- VOTE: RECONSIDERATION (65-Y 23-N)
- Engrossment reconsidered by House (65-Y 23-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd. (19-Y 4-N)
On January 19, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 13, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 995225809