+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0021)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 21 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1817ER)
- Enrolled
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (87-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (87-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102619D
+ − Votes (5)
February 6, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2013: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (87-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2013: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor