+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0252)
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 252 (effective 7/1/07)
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1816ER)
- Enrolled
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing (Suit)
On January 3, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 075185520