+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N)
- Read third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N)
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (13-Y 9-N)
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102296D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (5)
February 5, 2021: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2021: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N)
January 26, 2021: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N)
January 21, 2021: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 9-N)
January 19, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor