+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0210)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 210 (effective 3/16/11)
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1809ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 11100234D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1809E
- Emergency clause added
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100234D