+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 21, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0537)
On March 19, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 537 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 1997 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 5, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1808ER)
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (37-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 974335308-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 974335308-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 974335308-H1
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 8, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 973347308
+ − Votes (5)
February 13, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1997: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1997: Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor