+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101785D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (4)
February 5, 2021: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2021: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2021: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor