+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0415)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 415 (effective - see bill)
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1804ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1804H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106365D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19106365D-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2
On December 28, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101591D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 15, 2019: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2019: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2019: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2019: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2019: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor