+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 1-N)
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (3-Y 2-N)
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
On December 28, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101725D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
January 23, 2019: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 1-N)
January 16, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (3-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor