+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0154)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 154 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1801ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 11-N)
- Read third time and passed House (87-Y 11-N)
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 17102848D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1801E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendments (17-Y 5-N)
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 1-N)
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102848D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 14, 2017: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2017: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2017: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 11-N)
January 19, 2017: Reported from General Laws with amendments (17-Y 5-N)
January 17, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor