+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0662)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 662 (effective 7/1/22)
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB18ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N)
- Read third time
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 2-N)
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation
On December 23, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100965D