+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 12, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0907)
On March 29, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 907 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 8, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1797ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N 1-A)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (94-Y 3-N 1-A)
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 996743152-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 996743152-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
On February 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsider constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 996743152-S1
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 996738152-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 996738152-H1
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Passed House (94-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N 1-A)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Committee substitute printed 996738152-H1
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/sub. (24-Y 1-N)
On January 20, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 3
On January 13, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 993431152
+ − Votes (9)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N 1-A)
February 22, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1999: Reported from Transportation w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N 1-A)
February 6, 1999: Reported from Tra. w/sub. (24-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor