+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (9-Y 4-N)
On February 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 2-A)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N 2-A)
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 8, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 9, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 095807606
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 2009: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (9-Y 4-N)
February 10, 2009: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 2-A)
February 4, 2009: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor