+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 529 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB1796ER)
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1796ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (9-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N)
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1796H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 17105038D-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 17105038D-H1
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101220D
+ − Votes (8)
February 21, 2017: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2017: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2017: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2017: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (9-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2017: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
February 1, 2017: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor