+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (59)
On April 12, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0910)
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 910 (effective 7/1/05)
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1793ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (37-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (37-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
On April 5, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 29, 2005 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1793ER)
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by temporarily
- Floor substitute printed 057814800-S2 (Quayle)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
- Floor substitute printed 057816800-S3 (Quayle)
- Committee substitute rejected 057805712-S1
- Substitute by Sen. Quayle withdrawn 057814800-S2
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Sen. Quayle agreed to 057816800-S3
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB1793S3
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute agreed to 057805712-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 057805712-S1
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 052712284-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1793E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds (24-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to App. sub-committee: Compensation & General ...
On January 5, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 052712284