+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0639)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 639 (effective 7/1/09)
On February 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1791ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 2-N)
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (65-Y 33-N)
- Read third time and passed House (65-Y 33-N)
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 9-N)
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting
On January 15, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance
On January 9, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 091247440
+ − Votes (6)
February 24, 2009: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2009: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 2-N)
February 4, 2009: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (65-Y 33-N)
January 30, 2009: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 9-N)
January 28, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor