+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 6, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0103)
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 103 (effective 7/1/02)
On February 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB179ER)
On February 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. (11-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 18, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 16, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 15, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/02/02 026081932