+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Incorporated by Tra. (HB1570-Black) by voice vote
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N 2-A)
- Read third time and passed House (93-Y 4-N 2-A)
On February 1, 2001 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 019149776-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 019149776-H1
- Read second time
On January 31, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2001 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 019149776-H1
- Reported from Tra. w/sub (25-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 1
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/29/00 019005776
+ − Votes (2)
February 2, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N 2-A)
January 30, 2001: Reported from Tra. w/sub (25-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor