+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0437)
On March 19, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 437 (effective 7/1/07)
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1785ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
On December 28, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 074661276
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 14, 2007: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2007: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor