+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0181)
On March 9, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 181 (effective 7/1/07)
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1782ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1782H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 079381276-H1
- Read second time
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 079381276-H1
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #1 (Welch)
On December 28, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 078461276