+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Tabled in Appropriations (21-Y 4-N)
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to App. sub-committee: 10
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from General Laws with sub (22-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/06/04 047192228
+ − Votes (2)
February 13, 2004: Tabled in Appropriations (21-Y 4-N)
February 10, 2004: Reported from General Laws with sub (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor