+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 31, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0368)
On March 24, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 368 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 8, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1778ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Senate amd. agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Public Ed.
On February 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N)
On January 28, 1999 in the House:
- Printed as reengrossed 993679131-E
- Reengrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Mr. Black agreed to
On January 27, 1999 in the House:
- Engrossment reconsidered by House
- Passed by for the day
On January 26, 1999 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 993679131-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 25, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (24-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 2
On January 14, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
On January 13, 1999 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 993679131