+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 362 (effective 7/1/11)
On March 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1776ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 3-N 1-A)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (89-Y 3-N 1-A)
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 18-N)
- Read third time and passed House (80-Y 18-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Read second time
On February 6, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101094D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 23, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 3-N 1-A)
February 21, 2011: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2011: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2011: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 18-N)
February 4, 2011: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor