+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0340)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 340 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1772ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (11-Y 4-N)
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 9-N)
- Read third time and passed House (89-Y 9-N)
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 3-N)
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #2
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103244D
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2011: Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N)
February 17, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2011: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 4-N)
January 26, 2011: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 9-N)
January 21, 2011: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 3-N)
January 20, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor