+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0281)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 281 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1770ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1770H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104542D-H1
- Read second time
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13104542D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103231D
+ − Votes (5)
February 14, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2013: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor